Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/08/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/29/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/23/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/25/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/21/2011