Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/06/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/08/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/15/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 10/21/2011