Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/08/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/11/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/02/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/10/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/02/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/23/2011