There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing support for designation of a "Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans Day".


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/28/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/30/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
03/28/2012Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
03/28/2012Introduced in House

Cosponsors (33)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 03/28/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5] 04/16/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/24/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/13/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/28/2012 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs03/30/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.601. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/28/2012)

Honors and recognizes the contributions of veterans who served in Vietnam.

Encourages the people of the United States to observe Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans Day with appropriate ceremonies and activities.