Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 03/28/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/28/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/16/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/24/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/13/2012