There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives regarding the notice signed by the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency Lisa Jackson on March 27, 2012, entitled "Standards of Performance for Greenhouse Gas Emissions for New Stationary Sources: Electric Utility Generating Units".


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/29/2012 Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
04/30/2012 Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
03/30/2012 Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
03/29/2012 Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
03/29/2012 Introduced in House

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/29/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/08/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/29/2012 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power03/30/2012 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

No related bill information was received for H.Res.606.

Subjects (12)

  • Administrative law and regulatory procedures
  • Air quality
  • Climate change and greenhouse gases
  • Coal
  • Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
  • Economic performance and conditions
  • Electric power generation and transmission
  • Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
  • Environmental regulatory procedures
  • Public utilities and utility rates
  • Unemployment

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.606. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/29/2012)

Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that: (1) Americans rely on coal and the inexpensive energy it provides for nearly half of our energy needs; (2) the proposed rule entitled "Standards of Performance for Greenhouse Gas Emissions for New Stationary Sources: Electric Utility Generating Units" will likely lead to increased energy costs, resulting in the loss of American jobs, making American businesses less competitive, and damaging our nation's economic recovery; and (3) the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) should not be setting energy policy with environmental regulations that dictate fuel choices for new power plants.