Text: H.Res.607 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/29/2012)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 112th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Res. 607 Introduced in House (IH)]

112th CONGRESS
  2d Session
H. RES. 607

   Congratulating Western Washington University on winning its first 
  Division II NCAA National Basketball Title in the school's 110-year 
                                history.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                             March 29, 2012

   Mr. Larsen of Washington (for himself, Ms. Herrera Beutler, Mrs. 
McMorris Rodgers, Mr. Dicks, Mr. McDermott, Mr. Reichert, Mr. Smith of 
  Washington, and Mr. Hastings of Washington) submitted the following 
 resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Education and the 
                               Workforce

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
   Congratulating Western Washington University on winning its first 
  Division II NCAA National Basketball Title in the school's 110-year 
                                history.

Whereas on March 24, 2012, the Western Washington University Vikings defeated 
        the University of Montevallo Falcons by a score of 72 to 65, in the NCAA 
        Division II championship game, giving the Vikings their first 
        Championship win in program history;
Whereas the Western Washington University Vikings entered the Elite Eight 
        tournament in Highland Heights, Kentucky, on March 21, 2012, and 
        defeated the Midwestern State University Mustangs by a score of 64 to 63 
        in the Quarterfinals;
Whereas on March 22, 2012, Western Washington University defeated the Stonehill 
        College Skyhawks in the Semifinals of the Elite Eight by a score of 71 
        to 66;
Whereas the Western Washington University men's basketball team and their coach, 
        Brad Jackson, deserve an immense amount of respect and credit for their 
        resolve and triumph in the NCAA Division II championship;
Whereas Brad Jackson's dedication as the team's coach for 27 years, the longest 
        tenure in school history, is admirable and worthy of praise; and
Whereas Western Washington University has defeated its opponents and the odds to 
        win a national title: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the House of Representatives congratulates Western 
Washington University for winning the Division II NCAA men's basketball 
championship, the first win in school history.
                                 <all>