Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/26/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 01/26/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 01/26/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/08/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/08/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/08/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/08/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/08/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/09/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/09/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/09/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 02/09/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/09/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/09/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 02/09/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/09/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/09/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/09/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/09/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/09/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/09/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/09/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/09/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/11/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/11/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/17/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/17/2011