Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/09/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/15/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/15/2012
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/17/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/01/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/01/2012