Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/05/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/11/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/11/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/17/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/17/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/24/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/24/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/11/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/05/2012