Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/17/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 05/17/2012
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 05/30/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/31/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/31/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/06/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 06/06/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/18/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 06/18/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/20/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/27/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/10/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/17/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 09/11/2012