Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 05/30/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 05/30/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 05/30/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/31/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 05/31/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/05/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/05/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/12/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 06/26/2012