Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/12/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/12/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/15/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/15/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/27/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/11/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/13/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/18/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/26/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 08/02/2012