There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing support for the XIX International AIDS Conference (AIDS 2012) and the sense of the House of Representatives that continued commitment by the United States to HIV/AIDS research, prevention, and treatment programs is crucial to protecting global health.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/28/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
06/29/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
06/28/2012Referred to House Energy and Commerce
06/28/2012Referred to House Foreign Affairs
06/28/2012Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/28/2012Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1174-1175)
06/28/2012Introduced in House

Cosponsors (63)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/09/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/09/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/09/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 07/09/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/09/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/09/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/09/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/09/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/09/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 07/09/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 07/09/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/09/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/09/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/09/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/09/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 07/09/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/09/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/10/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/10/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/10/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/10/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/10/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/10/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/12/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/12/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/12/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/12/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/12/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/12/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/17/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/17/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/17/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/17/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/17/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/17/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/17/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/17/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/17/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/17/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/17/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/17/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/17/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/17/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/17/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/19/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/19/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/19/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/19/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/19/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/19/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/19/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/19/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/19/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/24/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/24/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/24/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/24/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/24/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/24/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/24/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/24/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/24/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/24/2012

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs06/28/2012 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce06/28/2012 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/29/2012 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.713.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.713. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/28/2012)

Supports the XIX International AIDS Conference and the goal of bringing renewed awareness of, and commitment to, addressing the HIV/AIDS crisis in the United States and abroad.

Recognizes that continued U.S. commitment to HIV/AIDS research, prevention, and treatment programs is crucial to protecting global health and commits to supporting a stronger global response to HIV/AIDS.

Encourages public and private sector development of innovative therapies and advances in clinical treatment for HIV/AIDS.