There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that any deal replacing the Budget Control Act of 2011 should contain serious revenue increases and no Medicare, Medicaid, and Social Security benefit cuts.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/18/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date All Actions
07/20/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
07/19/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
07/18/2012Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, Armed Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/18/2012Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, Armed Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/18/2012Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, Armed Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/18/2012Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, Armed Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/18/2012Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, Armed Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/18/2012Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, Armed Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/18/2012Introduced in House

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/18/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/18/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/18/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/07/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/21/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/09/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/28/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/28/2012

Committees (6)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Budget07/18/2012 Referred to
House Ways and Means07/18/2012 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce07/18/2012 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health07/20/2012 Referred to
House Armed Services07/18/2012 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure07/18/2012 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation07/19/2012 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce07/18/2012 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.733.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.733. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/18/2012)

Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that any deal on taxes and spending to replace the Budget Control Act of 2011 should: (1) not cut Medicare, Medicaid, or Social Security benefits; (2) contain serious revenue increases, including closing corporate tax loopholes and increasing individual income tax rates for the highest earners; (3) significantly reduce defense spending to focus the U.S. Armed Forces on combating 21st century risks; and (4) promote economic growth and expanded economic opportunity by including strong levels of job-creating federal investments in areas such as infrastructure and education, and by promoting private investment.