Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/18/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/18/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/18/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/18/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/07/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/21/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/09/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/28/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/28/2012