Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 07/31/2012
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 08/01/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/10/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 09/10/2012
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/20/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/20/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/20/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/20/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/20/2012
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/20/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/20/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 09/20/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/20/2012
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/20/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/20/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 09/20/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/20/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/20/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/20/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/20/2012
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/20/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/21/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/21/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 09/21/2012