Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 08/02/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/11/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/11/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/11/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/11/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/11/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/11/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/11/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/11/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/11/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/11/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/11/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/11/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/11/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/11/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/11/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/11/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/11/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/11/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/11/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 09/11/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/11/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/11/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/11/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/11/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/11/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/11/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/11/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/11/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/11/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/11/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/11/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/11/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/11/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/11/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/11/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/11/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/11/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/11/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/11/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/11/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/11/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/11/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/11/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/11/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/11/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/11/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 09/11/2012
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/11/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/11/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/11/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/11/2012
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/11/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/11/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/11/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 09/11/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/11/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/11/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/11/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/11/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/11/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/11/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/11/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/12/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/12/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/12/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/14/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 09/14/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/14/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/14/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/14/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/14/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/14/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/14/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/14/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/21/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 09/21/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/21/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/21/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 09/21/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/12/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/13/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/13/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/13/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/30/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/30/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/30/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/30/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/30/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/04/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 12/04/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/05/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/12/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/12/2012
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/12/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/12/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/12/2012
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 12/12/2012