Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 08/02/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 08/02/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/10/2012
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/11/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/14/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/19/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/19/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/20/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/20/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 09/20/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/21/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/21/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/25/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 09/25/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/28/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 10/02/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/16/2012