There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representative that the Boys & Girls Clubs of America should be commended for their unique role in improving outcomes for millions of youth and thousands of communities.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/10/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
09/19/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement.
09/10/2012Referred to House Judiciary
09/10/2012Referred to House Education and the Workforce
09/10/2012Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/10/2012Introduced in House

Cosponsors (73)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 09/10/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 09/10/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/10/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 09/12/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 09/12/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/12/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/12/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/12/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/19/2012
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/19/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5] 09/19/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/19/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 09/19/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 09/19/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/19/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/19/2012
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/19/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/19/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/19/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 09/19/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/19/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/19/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/19/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 09/19/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/21/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/21/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/21/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/21/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/21/2012
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/21/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 09/21/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/21/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/28/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/28/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/09/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/09/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/09/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/09/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 11/09/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 11/09/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/15/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 11/15/2012
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 11/15/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 11/15/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/07/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/07/2012

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce09/10/2012 Referred to
House Judiciary09/10/2012 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement09/19/2012 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.774.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.774. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/10/2012)

Commends the Boys & Girls Clubs of America for their work serving youth and strengthening our communities.

Recognizes the importance of high-impact youth mentoring in ensuring positive outcomes for youth of all backgrounds.

Supports youth mentoring as a strategy to reduce anti-social and risky youth behavior and develop productive, contributing young adults.

Encourages the Boys & Girls Clubs of America to continue and expand programs that expose young people to Science, Technology, Engineering and Math (STEM).

Commits to finding ways to increase the federal strategic and financial partnerships between the Boys & Girls Clubs of America and various federal agencies and departments in order to serve even more young people.