Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/12/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/12/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/18/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 09/18/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/19/2012
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/19/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/19/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/21/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 09/21/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/21/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 09/21/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/25/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/30/2012