Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/10/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/18/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/01/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/29/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/30/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/03/2011