There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives regarding the conditions for the United States becoming a signatory to the United Nations Arms Trade Treaty, or to any similar agreement on the arms trade.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/16/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
11/16/2012Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
11/16/2012Introduced in House

Cosponsors (89)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 11/16/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 11/16/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 11/16/2012
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 11/16/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 11/16/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/27/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/27/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/27/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/27/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/27/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 11/28/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 11/28/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 11/28/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 12/03/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/03/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/13/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs11/16/2012 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.814.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.814. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/16/2012)

Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that: (1) the President should not sign the Arms Trade Treaty and, if he transmits the Treaty with his signature to the Senate, the Senate should not ratify it; and (2) until the Treaty has been signed by the President, received the advice and consent of the Senate, and has been the subject of implementing legislation by Congress, no federal funds should be appropriated or authorized to implement Treaty, or any similar agreement, or to conduct activities relevant to the Treaty or any similar agreement.