Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/10/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/10/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 02/14/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/16/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/16/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/17/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 02/17/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/28/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/28/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/28/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/28/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/03/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/09/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/10/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/15/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/14/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/14/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/14/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/14/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/14/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/02/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/02/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/02/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/02/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/02/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/02/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 05/02/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/02/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 05/04/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/04/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/05/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/05/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/05/2011