Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 02/10/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 02/11/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/11/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/11/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/11/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/11/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/11/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/11/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/11/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/11/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/03/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/03/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/10/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/11/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/11/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/29/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/04/2011