Text: H.Res.86 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/11/2011)


112th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. RES. 86

Recognizing the importance of trade to the United States economy and the importance of passing free trade agreements with Colombia, South Korea, and Panama.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
February 11, 2011

Mr. Frelinghuysen submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Ways and Means


RESOLUTION

Recognizing the importance of trade to the United States economy and the importance of passing free trade agreements with Colombia, South Korea, and Panama.

Whereas trade is an efficient means to create private sector jobs;

Whereas the International Trade Administration has noted that from 2007 to 2008, exports had increased to each and every trading partner with which the United States has a free trade agreement;

Whereas the World Trade Organization’s Doha Development Round began on November 14, 2001, in Doha, Qatar and is currently ongoing;

Whereas the Trade Act of 2002 (Public Law 107–210) provided the President of the United States with fast track negotiating authority for trade agreements, but such authority expired on July 1, 2007;

Whereas the United States and Colombia signed the United States-Colombia Trade Promotion Agreement on November 22, 2006;

Whereas the United States and Panama signed the United States-Panama Free Trade Agreement on June 28, 2007;

Whereas the United States and South Korea signed the United States-Korea Free Trade Agreement on June 30, 2007, and that agreement was modified and again signed on December 3, 2010;

Whereas these 3 trade agreements have not been ratified by the United States Congress;

Whereas these trade agreements will have profoundly positive diplomatic impacts that will serve to solidify United States relations with rising regional economic powers; and

Whereas the United States must continue to expand its trading relationships to create jobs: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That—

(1) the House of Representatives recognizes the importance of reduced trade barriers to the United States for promoting economic development, creating jobs, and solidifying relations with trading partners; and

(2) it is the sense of the House of Representatives that the United States-Colombia Trade Promotion Agreement, United States-Panama Free Trade Agreement, and United States-Korea Free Trade Agreement should be implemented immediately.