Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/15/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/15/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/15/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/15/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/15/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 02/15/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 02/15/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/15/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/15/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/15/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/15/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/15/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/15/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/16/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/16/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 02/16/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/16/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/16/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/16/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/16/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/16/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/16/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/16/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/16/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/16/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 02/16/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/16/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/16/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/16/2011
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/16/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/16/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/16/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/16/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/16/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/16/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/16/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/16/2011
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 02/16/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/16/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/16/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/16/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/16/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/16/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/16/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/16/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/16/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/16/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/16/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/16/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/18/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 02/18/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/18/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/18/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/18/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/18/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/18/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/18/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/18/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/18/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/18/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/18/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/18/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/18/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/18/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/18/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/18/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 02/18/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/18/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/18/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/18/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/18/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/18/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/18/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/18/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/18/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/18/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/18/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 02/18/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/18/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/18/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/18/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/18/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/18/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/18/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/18/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/18/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/18/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/18/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/18/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/18/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/18/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/18/2011
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/18/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/18/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/18/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/18/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/18/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/18/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/18/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/18/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/18/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/18/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/18/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 02/18/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/18/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/18/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 02/18/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/28/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/28/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/14/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/14/2011