Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/11/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/12/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/01/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 10/12/2011