Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 05/18/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 05/18/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 05/18/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 05/18/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 05/18/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/18/2011
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 05/18/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/24/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/24/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/24/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/24/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 06/06/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/09/2011
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 06/14/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/16/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/16/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/16/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/16/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 06/16/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/16/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/16/2011
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/16/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/16/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/23/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 09/13/2011