Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/25/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 01/25/2011
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 01/27/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 01/31/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 02/07/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 02/07/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 02/07/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 02/07/2011
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 02/08/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 02/08/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/15/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 02/28/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/07/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/15/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/04/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 04/04/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/05/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 09/20/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 09/20/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 09/20/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/21/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/22/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 10/03/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 02/16/2012
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 03/21/2012
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 06/14/2012
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/23/2012
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/23/2012