Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/18/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/18/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/19/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/19/2011
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/19/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/19/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/19/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/19/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 05/23/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/14/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 01/30/2012
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 01/31/2012
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/02/2012
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 02/02/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/14/2012
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 02/14/2012
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 02/14/2012
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 02/15/2012