There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Sergei Magnitsky Rule of Law Accountability Act of 2012

Short Titles as Introduced

Sergei Magnitsky Rule of Law Accountability Act of 2011

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to impose sanctions on persons responsible for the detention, abuse, or death of Sergei Magnitsky, for the conspiracy to defraud the Russian Federation of taxes on corporate profits through fraudulent transactions and lawsuits against Hermitage, and for other gross violations of human rights in the Russian Federation, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
07/23/2012Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Kerry with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 112-191.
05/19/2011Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date
07/23/2012Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 469.
Action By: Senate
07/23/2012Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Kerry with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 112-191.
06/26/2012Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
05/19/2011Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3181-3182)
Action By: Senate
05/19/2011Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3179-3181)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/23/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/23/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/26/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/16/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/20/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 08/02/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 08/02/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 09/15/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 11/07/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 11/09/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 11/10/2011
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 11/10/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 01/23/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/06/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/13/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/14/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/21/2012
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 03/21/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/18/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/07/2012
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 05/24/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/12/2012
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/21/2012
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/18/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/18/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations05/19/2011 Referred to
06/26/2012 Markup by
07/23/2012 Reported by S. Rept. 112-191

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1039. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (07/23/2012)

Sergei Magnitsky Rule of Law Accountability Act of 2012 - Directs the Secretary of State to publish and update a list of each person the Secretary has reason to believe: (1) is responsible for, or benefitted financially from, the detention, abuse, or death of Sergei Magnitsky, participated in related liability concealment efforts, or was involved in the criminal conspiracy uncovered by Sergei Magnitsky; or (2) is responsible for extrajudicial killings, torture, or other human rights violations committed against individuals seeking to promote human rights or to expose illegal activity carried out by officials of the government of the Russian Federation.

Makes an alien on such list ineligible to enter or be admitted to the United States. Revokes any visa issued for such person.

Authorizes the Secretary to waive such prohibition if in the U.S. national security interest or if necessary for compliance with the Agreement between the United Nations (U.N.) and the United States of America regarding the Headquarters of the United Nations. Requires congressional notification of any such waiver.

Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to freeze and prohibit U.S. property transactions of an individual who is on the list if such property and property interests are in the United States, come within the United States, or are in or come within the control of a U.S. person or entity. Authorizes the Secretary to waive such actions if in the U.S. national security interest. Requires congressional notification of any such waiver.

Directs the Secretary and the Secretary of the Treasury to report annually to Congress regarding actions taken pursuant to this Act.