Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 05/19/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/23/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/23/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/26/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/16/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/20/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 08/02/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 08/02/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 09/15/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 11/07/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 11/09/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 11/10/2011
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 11/10/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 01/23/2012
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/06/2012
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/13/2012
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/14/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/21/2012
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 03/21/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/18/2012
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/07/2012
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 05/24/2012
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/12/2012
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/21/2012
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/18/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/18/2012