Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 05/23/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 05/23/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 05/23/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 05/23/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/23/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 05/23/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/24/2011
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 05/24/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/24/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/24/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/24/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/25/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 05/26/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 05/26/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/06/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/06/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/06/2011
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/08/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/08/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/08/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/09/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/09/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/09/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/09/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/09/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/14/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 06/14/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/15/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/16/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/20/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/22/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/22/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/22/2011
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/22/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/22/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/23/2011
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/23/2011
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 06/23/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/27/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/30/2011
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 06/30/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/30/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 07/05/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 07/05/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/11/2011
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/13/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 07/18/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/19/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/19/2011
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/20/2011
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/21/2011
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 07/21/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 07/25/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 07/25/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/26/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/27/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/28/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 08/01/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 08/02/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 08/02/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/06/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/07/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 09/07/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/19/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/20/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 09/20/2011
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 09/20/2011
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/20/2011
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 09/20/2011
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/21/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 09/21/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/22/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 09/23/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 10/04/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/11/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/31/2011
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 11/09/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 11/15/2011
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 11/16/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 11/17/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/05/2012