Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 05/24/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/24/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/24/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/24/2011
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/24/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 05/24/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 05/24/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 05/24/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 05/24/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 05/24/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 05/24/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/25/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/06/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/14/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/21/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/29/2011