Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 05/25/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 05/25/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 05/25/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 05/25/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 05/25/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 05/25/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 05/25/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/27/2011
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/12/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/27/2011
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/28/2011
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 10/06/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 08/02/2012