Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 05/25/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/25/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 05/25/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/20/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 12/06/2011
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 12/06/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/12/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/12/2012
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/12/2012
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 04/16/2012
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/23/2012
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 09/11/2012