Summary: S.1074 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Information (Except Text)

There is one summary for S.1074. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/25/2011)

Amends the USA PATRIOT Improvement and Reauthorization Act of 2005 to make the following provisions of the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act of 1978, subject to exceptions, read as they read on October 25, 2001 (prior to enactment of the USA PATRIOT Act on October 26, 2001): (1) effective June 1, 2015, provisions specifying the directions to be contained in the orders of designated judges approving electronic surveillance of a foreign power or agent of a foreign power; and (2) effective May 27, 2011, provisions authorizing the Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI) to apply for orders requiring production of business records and other tangible things in investigations related to foreign intelligence and international terrorism and directing the Attorney General (DOJ) to annually inform Congress of such requests.