Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 05/26/2011
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/16/2012
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 02/16/2012
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/01/2012
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA] 03/01/2012
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/08/2012
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/08/2012
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/21/2012
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/21/2012
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 04/17/2012
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 04/24/2012
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/24/2012
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/10/2012
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/14/2012
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 11/29/2012