Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 05/26/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/26/2011
Sen. Brown, Scott P. [R-MA]* 05/26/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/07/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/07/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/09/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/09/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/09/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/13/2011
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/13/2011
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/20/2011
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/20/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/21/2011
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/21/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/23/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/27/2011
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 06/27/2011
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 06/28/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 06/28/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/28/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/28/2011
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/12/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/27/2011
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 08/01/2011
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/06/2011
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/06/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/06/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/06/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/06/2011
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/08/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/09/2011
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/13/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 09/13/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 09/15/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 09/16/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/21/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 09/23/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 09/26/2011