Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 05/26/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 05/26/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/12/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/14/2012
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/24/2012
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/15/2012