Text: S.1103 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-24 (07/26/2011)

 
[112th Congress Public Law 24]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]



[[Page 125 STAT. 238]]

Public Law 112-24
112th Congress

                                 An Act


 
 To extend the term of the incumbent Director of the Federal Bureau of 
          Investigation. <<NOTE: July 26, 2011 -  [S. 1103]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. <<NOTE: 28 USC 532 note.>> FINDINGS.

    Congress finds that--
            (1) on May 12, 2011, the President requested that Congress 
        extend the term of Robert S. Mueller III as Director of the 
        Federal Bureau of Investigation by 2 years, citing the critical 
        need for continuity and stability at the Federal Bureau of 
        Investigation in the face of ongoing threats to the United 
        States and leadership transitions at the Federal agencies 
        charged with protecting national security;
            (2) in light of the May 1, 2011, successful operation 
        against Osama bin Laden, the continuing threat to national 
        security, and the approaching 10th anniversary of the attacks of 
        September 11, 2001, the President's request for a limited, 1-
        time exception to the term limit of the Director of the Federal 
        Bureau of Investigation, in these exceptional circumstances, is 
        appropriate; and
            (3) this Act is intended to provide a 1-time exception to 
        the 10-year statutory limit on the term of the Director of the 
        Federal Bureau of Investigation in light of the President's 
        request and existing exceptional circumstances, and is not 
        intended to create a precedent.
SEC. 2. CREATION OF NEW TERM OF SERVICE FOR THE OFFICE OF DIRECTOR 
                    OF THE FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.

    Section 1101 of the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 
1968 (28 U.S.C. 532 note) is amended by adding at the end the following:
    ``(c)(1) <<NOTE: Effective date. Time period.>> Effective on the 
date of enactment of this subsection, a new term of service for the 
office of Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation shall be 
created, which shall begin on or after August 3, 2011, and continue 
until September 4, 2013. Notwithstanding the second sentence of 
subsection (b) of this section, the incumbent Director of the Federal 
Bureau of Investigation on the date of enactment of this subsection 
shall be eligible to be appointed to the new term of service provided 
for by this subsection, by and with the advice and consent of the 
Senate, and only for that new term of service. Nothing in this 
subsection shall prevent the President, by and with the advice of the 
Senate, from appointing an individual, other than the incumbent Director 
of the Federal Bureau of Investigation, to a 10-year term of service

[[Page 125 STAT. 239]]

subject to the provisions of subsection (b) after the date of enactment 
of this subsection.

    ``(2) The individual who is the incumbent in the office of the 
Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation on the date of enactment 
of this subsection may not serve as Director after September 4, 2013.
    ``(3) <<NOTE: Applicability.>> With regard to the individual who is 
the incumbent in the office of the Director of the Federal Bureau of 
Investigation on the date of enactment of this subsection, the second 
sentence of subsection (b) shall not apply.''.

    Approved July 26, 2011.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--S. 1103:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

SENATE REPORTS: No. 112-23 (Comm. on the Judiciary).
CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 157 (2011):
            July 21, considered and passed Senate.
            July 25, considered and passed House.

                                  <all>