Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 05/26/2011
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 06/14/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/20/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 10/31/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 11/01/2011
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 11/02/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 11/08/2011
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 11/15/2011
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 11/15/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 11/16/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 01/30/2012