Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 05/26/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/26/2011
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/26/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 05/26/2011
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/29/2011
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/29/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/21/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 11/01/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/15/2012
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/18/2012