Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 06/06/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 06/06/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 06/06/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/06/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/09/2011
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/13/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/28/2012
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/28/2012