Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 06/13/2011
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/13/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 06/13/2011
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 06/13/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 06/13/2011
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 06/13/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 06/13/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 06/13/2011
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 06/13/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 06/13/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 06/13/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/14/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/14/2011
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/15/2011
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/20/2011
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/23/2011
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/19/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/31/2011
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 10/31/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/02/2011
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 12/13/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 12/15/2011