Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 06/14/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 06/14/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 06/14/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 06/14/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 06/14/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 06/14/2011
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/16/2011
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/21/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 06/21/2011
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/21/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/21/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/21/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 06/21/2011
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 06/21/2011
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 06/21/2011
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 06/21/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/21/2011
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/21/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/22/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/22/2011
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/23/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/06/2011