Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 06/15/2011
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/15/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 06/15/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 06/15/2011
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 06/15/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 06/15/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 06/15/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/16/2011
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/16/2011
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/20/2011
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/22/2011
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/18/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 11/28/2011