Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 06/16/2011
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 06/16/2011
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 06/16/2011
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 06/16/2011
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/21/2011
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/20/2011
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/20/2011
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/08/2011
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 09/15/2011
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/21/2011
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/22/2011
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/26/2011
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 10/03/2011
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 11/01/2011
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/15/2011
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 12/01/2011
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 01/24/2012
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/28/2012