Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 06/16/2011
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 06/16/2011
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/30/2011
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/30/2011
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 06/30/2011
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/30/2011
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/20/2011
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 07/20/2011
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 08/02/2011
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/19/2011
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/21/2011
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 09/21/2011
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 09/21/2011
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/04/2011
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/04/2011
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 10/04/2011
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 10/06/2011